Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Lee P Rudofsky
Referred: Benecia B Moore
Case #: 4:24-cv-00341
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
12 12 utility Notice of Docket Correction Mon 02/03 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re11 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong case number). The correct document was added to docket entry11 and is attached hereto for service/review by the parties. (jbh)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/03 1:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kane Millsaps. (llg) (jbh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/3/2025) Main Document - Correct
Thursday, October 31, 2024
10 10 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 11/01 8:08 AM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that1 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice; and recommending that the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting this Recommended Disposition and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 10/31/2024. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
9 9 order Order Tue 08/27 10:54 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: It is unclear whether Plaintiff has received the Court's Orders2 and3 . The Clerk of Court is instructed to resend copies of Doc. Nos.1 -3 to Plaintiff. The Clerk is also directed to send Plaintiff a blank IFP Motion, including the necessary Certificate and Calculation Sheet. As stated in the Court's Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners3 , if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, either (1) pay the $405 filing fee in full; or (2) complete and sign the IFP Motion and return it to the Clerk. If Plaintiff does not timely comply with this Order, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 8/27/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 07/23 2:07 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Kane Millsaps re3 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners. Resent to updated address with corrected ADC number. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
7 7 misc Mail Returned Thu 06/27 10:32 AM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Kane Millsaps re 6 Text Entry Only Order. Resent to updated address with corrected ADC number. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
6 6 order Order Tue 06/04 8:52 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The Clerk of Court is instructed to update the docket sheet to reflect Plaintiff Kane Millsaps's correct inmate number as ADC #168646. The Clerk of Court is also instructed to resend copies of Doc. Nos.1 -3 to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 6/4/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
5 5 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/03 3:06 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Kane Millsaps re1 Complaint. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
4 4 misc Mail Returned Mon 05/20 4:53 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Kane Millsaps re2 Order on Amicus Briefs. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order Mon 04/22 11:53 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a blank IFP Motion, including the Certificate and Calculation sheet; directing the Plaintiff to, within 30 days of the date of this Order, either (1) pay the $405 filing fee in full; or (2) complete and sign the IFP Motion and return it to the Clerk; and directing the prison officials to assist Plaintiff in completing the necessary forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 4/22/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/18 4:14 PM
ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/21/2023. (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/18 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kane Millsaps. (llg)
Related: [-]