Patella v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Maritza Dominguez Braswel |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01031 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | El Paso District Court, 2024CV30147 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:08 PM MDT |
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Patella
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 05/01 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Madison Engel on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Madison Engel added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Engel, Madison) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/29 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert D. Jones on behalf of Jeffrey PatellaAttorney Robert D. Jones added to party Jeffrey Patella(pty:pla) (Jones, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/26 3:33 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 5/14/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/14/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/26/2024. (evaug ) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/24 3:28 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thu 04/18 9:40 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 04/18 9:39 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Thu 04/18 9:38 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon State Farm Mutual Insurance Company on 03/27/2024. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 9:36 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Jeffrey Patella. (blaws) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Thu 04/18 9:34 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 2:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wagner, Rebecca) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from El Paso District Court, Case Number 2024CV30147. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9642240), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-State Court Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Coversheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-State Court Entry of Appearance - Thomas M. Condas, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-State Court 2024-03-26 Status Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A-State Court Entry of Appearance - Robert D. Jones, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A-State Court 2024-03-27 Status Report, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit A-State Court Order re 2024-03-27 Status Report, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Voter Registration, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit C-Traffic Accident Report, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit D-Colorado Secretary of State Periodic Report, | ||
Att: 13 Register of Actions, | ||
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 15 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |