Fortner et al v. Prado et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Maritza Dominguez Braswel |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01037 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:09 PM MDT |
Defendant
Carri Claar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Freeman
|
|
Defendant
Roxanne Haffner
|
|
Defendant
Tammy O'Neal
|
|
Defendant
Amellia Prado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Does 1-5
|
|
Plaintiff
Darrell Fortner
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Thu 05/02 3:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting the United States'14 Opposed Motion for Extension of Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants Prado and Claar's deadlines to respond to the4 Complaint are extended to May 24, 2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 5/2/2024. Text Only Entry(mdblc1) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Certificate of Mailing/Service
Thu 05/02 9:05 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing re 28 Minute Order. Mailed to Darrell Fortner 205 West Harp Street Manchester, TN 37355 (dgumb, ) |
|
28 | 28
order
Minute Order
Thu 05/02 8:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Motion Hearing set for May 13, 2024, is reset in time only to May 13, 2024, at 1:30 PM . The parties should refer to the instructions for their video appearance previously provided. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 5/2/2024. Text Only Entry (mdblc1) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Mailing/Service
Tue 04/30 2:56 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re 26 and18 Minute Orders sent to Darrell Fortner at 205 West Harp Street Manchester, TN 37355.(jrobe, ) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Tue 04/30 10:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER striking Plaintiffs'25 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Motion is STRICKEN for non-compliance with applicable Local Rules. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(b) (providing that a party "who files an opposed motion for leave to amend... shall attach as an exhibit a copy of the proposed amended or supplemental pleading which strikes through (e.g. strikes through ) the text to be deleted and underlines (e.g. underlines ) the text to be added"). By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/30/2024. Text Only Entry(mdblc1) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Leave
Mon 04/29 4:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner.(jrobe, ) |
|
Att: 1 Second Amended Verified Complaint | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
Mon 04/29 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (jrobe, ) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/29 3:25 PM
NOTICE of State Court Filing by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado(Kelley, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Order RE Plaintiff Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/26 4:00 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/12/2024. (SEE ALSO ECF NO. 21 MINUTE ORDER -for Deadline for Consent 5/9/2024). By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/26/2024. (evaug ) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minute Order
Thu 04/25 12:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file a6 Magistrate Judge consent form on or before May 9, 2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/25/2024. Text Only Entry (mdblc1) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/25 11:59 AM
NOTICE of State Court Filing by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado(Kelley, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Mtn for Leave to Amend Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Reply to All Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Mailing/Service
Wed 04/24 1:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re18 Minute Order sent to Darrell Fortner at 6875 Juanita Street Colorado Springs, CO 80908. (jrobe, ) |
|
18 | 18
order
Minute Order
Wed 04/24 7:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER: A Motion Hearing to address the13 Motion to Substitute the United States as Defendant is set for May 13, 2024, at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. The Hearing will be conducted by video using the attached instructions. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/24/2024. Text Only Entry (mdblc1) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 04/19 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John T. Osgood on behalf of Roxanne HaffnerAttorney John T. Osgood added to party Roxanne Haffner(pty:dft) (Osgood, John) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Mailing/Service
Fri 04/19 4:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re 15 Minute Order sent to Darrell Fortner at 6875 Juanita Street Colorado Springs, CO 80908. (jrobe, ) |
|
15 | 15
order
Minute Order
Fri 04/19 2:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed, the United States'14 Opposed Motion for Extension of Defendants Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, Plaintiff is directed to file a response on or before April 30, 2024. No reply is required. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 04/19/2024. Text Only Entry (mdblc4,) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Fri 04/19 12:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re4 Complaint by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado. (Kelley, Erika) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Substitute Party
Thu 04/18 2:28 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party United States as Defendant by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado. (Kelley, Erika) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Filing Pending State Court Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado(Kelley, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Filing Pending State Court Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado(Kelley, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Pending State Court Hearing by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado (Kelley, Erika) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Filing Pending State Court Motion to Stay Deadline of Defendants by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado(Kelley, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Filing Pending State Court Defendant Roxanne Haffner Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado(Kelley, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Filing State Court Pleadings by Defendants Carri Claar, Amellia Prado(Kelley, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thu 04/18 9:57 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 04/18 9:56 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 9:53 AM
STATE COURT FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Carri Claar, Christopher Freeman, Roxanne Haffner, Tammy O'Neal, Amellia Prado, filed by Darrell Fortner. (blaws) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Thu 04/18 9:51 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Administrative Notice
Thu 04/18 9:51 AM
Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. § 1446(a). The state court record is not complete. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the Attorney Civil Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carri Claar, Amellia Prado from El Paso County Court, Case Number 2024CV000054., filed by Carri Claar, Amellia Prado.(Kelley, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Deeming Notice and Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit USA Certification, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Granted Motion for Extension of Time, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit State Court Register of Actions |