Brighthouse Life Insurance Company v. Rudolph
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00870 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 3:26 AM MST |
Defendant
Lawrence Rudolph
|
|
Plaintiff
Brighthouse Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 09/04 1:38 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lawrence Rudolph by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company.(D'Arcambal, Michelle) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Michelle d'Arcambal's Declaration in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Indictment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Superseding Indictment, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Mirabelli Trial Testimony, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Jury Verdict Form, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Petition for Adjudication of Interests, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Order Granting Government's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - SCRA Status Report, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Inmate Locater Search, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 11 Affidavit Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/22 10:42 AM
Disclosure Statement by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Brighthouse Financial, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (D'Arcambal, Michelle) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 08/21 1:40 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's second Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline to Comply with this Court's July 8, 2024, Order (Doc.17 ). Plaintiff shall have until September 4, 2024, to comply. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions of this deadline will be granted. Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa. (CR)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/21 10:31 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (LFIG) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 08/20 12:53 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Comply with the Court's July 8, 2024 Order [Second Request] by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company.(D'Arcambal, Michelle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 08/05 10:48 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc.15 ). Plaintiff shall have until 8/21/2024 to comply with the Court's 7/8/2024 Order. Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa. (CR) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 08/02 2:39 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Comply with the Court's July 8, 2024 Order by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company.(D'Arcambal, Michelle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Mon 07/08 11:02 AM
ORDER that by August 7, 2024, Plaintiff shall file either a motion for default judgment against Defendant Lawrence Rudolph; a report concerning the status of this case; or a notice of voluntarily dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the July 30, 2024, Rule 16 Scheduling Conference10 . Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/8/2024. (KLG) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 07/03 11:10 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lawrence Rudolph. (KLG) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Application for Entry of Default
Tue 07/02 12:54 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Brighthouse Life Insurance Company against Lawrence Rudolph.(D'Arcambal, Michelle) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle J. d'Arcambal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/22 2:32 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company re:10 Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, . (D'Arcambal, Michelle) |
|
10 | 10
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 05/22 12:34 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Scheduling Conference is set for July 30, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 605...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 21 days before the Scheduling Conference as Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) requires. The plaintiff shall file the Joint Case Management Report with the Clerk not less than seven (7) days before the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference...IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this order upon any Defendant(s) who have not yet appeared and shall file notice of service. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/21/2024. (KLG) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Tue 05/21 10:13 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, and Standard Civil Track Initial Order upon Lawrence Rudolph on 05/10/2024. (D'Arcambal, Michelle) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 05/17 11:53 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michelle D'Arcambal on behalf of Plaintiff Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 04/18 12:23 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than July 15, 2024. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on July 16, 2024, the Clerk of Court, without further notice, shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/18/2024. (KLG) |
|
7 | 7
67
pgs
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 04/18 10:48 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint Exhibits A - F by Plaintiff Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Jacobsohn, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Wed 04/17 2:33 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company,1 Complaint filed by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 2:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Lawrence Rudolph. (REK) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 04/17 2:31 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22955966. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-00870 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 04/17 2:29 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (submitted by Andrew Jacobsohn) (REK) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 2:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (submitted by Andrew Jacobsohn) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22955966 filed by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (submitted by Andrew Jacobsohn)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |