6
|
|
6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/25 10:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Pachoud. Surfshark Inc. served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Abiri, Robert)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Surfshark Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/18 3:41 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/18 2:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2024. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/18 11:32 AM
Proposed Summons. (Abiri, Robert)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
27
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Surfshark B.V., Surfshark Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19330356.). Filed by Emily Pachoud.(Abiri, Robert)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - Venue Declaration,
|
| |
Att: 2
Civil Cover Sheet
|