Plunkett v. San Diego Post Office
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew G Schopler |
Referred: | Allison H Goddard |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00696 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act (Definitions) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 24SC00787C |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
San Diego Post Office
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pablo Boines Plunkett
1 14 Street Apt 649
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/23 10:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER (AGS): Good cause appearing, defendant's ex parte motion to extend the time to respond to the complaint (ECF2 ) is granted. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). The deadline for defendant to respond to the complaint is June 17, 2024. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 4/23/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (no document attached) (smf) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order of Judge Transfer
Mon 04/22 8:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John A. Houston is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24cv00696 AGS-AHG.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (bdc) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/17 4:15 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by San Diego Post Office.(Boutelle, Betsey) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL, Fee Waived, filed by San Diego Post Office. The new case number is 3:24-cv-696-JAH-AHG. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(axi) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service |