Jordan v. United States Department of Justice et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Janis L Sammartino |
Referred: | Jill L Burkhardt |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00697 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1346 U.S. Defendant |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 to 10
|
|
Defendant
Brady James Smith
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Andrew Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 04/19 3:42 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Response due by 5/3/2024. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/19/24.(aas) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 3:14 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 to 10, Brady James Smith, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18767728.), filed by Kyle Andrew Jordan. The new case number is 3:24-cv-697-JLS-JLB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Ghaffari, Evan)(sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |