Galczynski v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Stacie F Beckerman |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00660 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 04/26 3:53 PM
Notice of Appearance of Christopher Vieira appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Vieira, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/25 11:13 AM
Notice of Appearance of Kevin C. Danielson appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Danielson, Kevin) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Correction of the Record
Mon 04/22 10:58 AM
Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding2 Application for leave to proceed ifp. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: An illegible PDF was attached to the entry. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) |
||
order
Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT
Mon 04/22 1:12 PM
ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No.2 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 9:15 AM
Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (le) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Wed 04/17 2:17 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Devan A. Galczynski. (Taylor, Katie) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Wed 04/17 2:15 PM
Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected) . Plaintiff consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Filed by Devan A. Galczynski against Commissioner Social Security Administration Social Security Answer is due by 8/15/2024.. (Taylor, Katie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |