WHITEHEAD v. TICE et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Lanzillo |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00084 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 28:1441cr Notice of Removal - Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 11:05 PM EDT |
Defendant
CAPT. ABBOTT
|
|
Defendant
MR. CAPRIOTTI
|
|
Defendant
MR. EMEIGH
|
|
Defendant
MS. GAUNTHER
|
|
Defendant
P.A. HOUSE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SGT. HUBER
|
|
Defendant
C/O MACHESKY
|
|
Defendant
P.A. PLASO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ERIC TICE
|
|
Defendant
SGT. WILLIAMS
|
|
Plaintiff
CARL WHITEHEAD
EK5805 SCI SOMERSET Smart Communications/PADOC P.O. Box 33028
St. Petersburg, FL 33733 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/26 10:55 AM
This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo pursuant to Administrative Order 2024-03 filed at 2:24-mc-10001. Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer assigned to case. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/17 12:30 PM
Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy presiding due to related cases. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer assigned to case. (jkn) |
||
misc
QC - Case opened in incorrect division
Wed 04/17 1:55 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Case previously opened in incorrect division. CORRECTION: Case 2:24-cv-566 has been deleted and all future filings are to be submitted at 3:24-cv-084. This message is for informational purposes only. (cww) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Filing fee: $405, receipt number 200008761 (jkn) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Somerset County, case number 55-CIVIL-2024, filed by P.A. PLASO, P.A. HOUSE. (O'Neal, Stuart) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (jkn) |