Ohai v. Park Tree Inv. 20, LLC
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steve C Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01597 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Debtor
Emmanuel Ohai
, |
|
Debtor
Luminate Ohai
, |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Appellant
Emmanuel Ohai
863 Flat Shoals Rd. SE C #155
Conyers, GA 30094 |
|
Appellee
Park Tree Inv. 20, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
appeal
Designation of Record on Appeal
Tue 04/23 4:08 PM
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Emmanuel Ohai re1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, Case Appealed to USBC NDGA - Gainesville Division, Case Number 23-5041 wlh. (rsg) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Directing Payment of the Filing Fee ~Util - Directing Party to File an Authorization and Affidavit
Fri 04/19 4:34 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the appeal fee of $298.00 to the Bankruptcy Court or file the appropriate application and supporting documents to obtain in forma pauperis status in this Court within thirty (30) days. In deference to Appellant's pro se status, the Clerk is directed to forward a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis together with this Order. If Appellantpays the appeal fee to the Bankruptcy Court, she is likewise ORDERED to notifythis Court in writing within thirty (30) days. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action. IFP Form Sent. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/19/2024. (rsg) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/19 4:40 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Emmanuel Ohai re2 Order Directing Payment of the Filing Fee, Order Directing Party to File an Authorization and Affidavit. IFP Form Sent. (rsg) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Wed 04/17 9:58 AM
Submission of1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for fee determination to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (gww) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal
Wed 04/17 9:54 AM
Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 12-65475 wlh, ADV case#: 23-5041 wlh. Notice of Appeal filed 4/12/2024 from Order entered 4/9/2024 by Appellant Emmanuel Ohai. Fee Paid: No. filed by Emmanuel Ohai.(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Order Being Appealed, | ||
Att: 3 Docket Sheet |