Jackson v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Referred: | J Elizabeth Mcbath |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01602 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jena Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Wed 04/24 9:55 AM
Clerk's Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 04/24/2024. (nav) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Tue 04/23 8:49 AM
Clerk's Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 9:13 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Jena Jackson. (Weiner, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 2:08 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (bmr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jena Jackson. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13367064)(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |