Hill v. Upton
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Eleanor L Ross |
Referred: | Catherine M Salinas |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01608 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline
Wed 04/24 1:36 PM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis stamped with the case number for this action. Petitioner is ORDERED to complete and submit the application within 30 days of the date this Order is entered. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned upon receipt of the required fees or application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or at the expiration of the aforementioned time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 4/24/24. (ces) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/24 1:37 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Hill re2 Order. Forms sent: application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ces) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/17 9:37 AM
Submission of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (rsg) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 04/17 9:37 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jonathan Hill.(rsg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit |