Mendez-Concepcion et al v. AIM Transportation, LLC et al
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca Grady Jennings |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00240 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
AIM Transportation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ahmed Osman
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Kentucky Employers Mutual Insurance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Mendez-Concepcion
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response to Notice of Deficiency
Wed 04/24 10:00 AM
Response to5 Notice of Deficiency, filed by AIM Transportation, LLC. (Rosenthal, Lee) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency
Wed 04/17 2:54 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Matthew E. Chandler re1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: full admission to WDKY motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/3/2024. (KJA) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 1:40 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Oldham Circuit Court (MNM) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1))
Wed 04/17 1:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by AIM Transportation, LLC. (MNM) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Wed 04/17 1:33 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (MNM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ahmed Osman and AIM Transportation, LLC from Oldham Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-00123 (filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4014725). (MNM) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court File, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet | ||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/17 1:35 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action by AIM Transportation, LLC and Ahmed Osman. (MNM) |
||
motion
Intervene
Wed 04/17 1:37 PM
MOTION to Intervene previously filed in state court action by by Intervenor Plaintiff Kentucky Employers Mutual Insurance (MNM) |