New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:24-cv-05225
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
OFFICER DAVID ADE
Represented By
JAMES R BIRCHMEIER
Madden & Madden
contact info
JAMES R. BIRCHMEIER
Birchmeier & Powell LLC
contact info
Defendant
CITY OF WILDWOOD
Represented By
JAMES R BIRCHMEIER
Madden & Madden
contact info
JAMES R. BIRCHMEIER
Birchmeier & Powell LLC
contact info
Defendant
CHIEF ROBERT REGALBUTO
Represented By
JAMES R BIRCHMEIER
Madden & Madden
contact info
JAMES R. BIRCHMEIER
Birchmeier & Powell LLC
contact info
Defendant
OFFICER SAMUEL STANGO
Represented By
JAMES R BIRCHMEIER
Madden & Madden
contact info
JAMES R. BIRCHMEIER
Birchmeier & Powell LLC
contact info
Defendant
DETECTIVE JAMES STEVENS
Represented By
JAMES R BIRCHMEIER
Madden & Madden
contact info
JAMES R. BIRCHMEIER
Birchmeier & Powell LLC
contact info
Defendant
WILDWOOD POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
JAMES R BIRCHMEIER
Madden & Madden
contact info
JAMES R. BIRCHMEIER
Birchmeier & Powell LLC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Plaintiff
JOSHUA BOCCHINO
Represented By
JOEL SILBERMAN
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/03 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID ELIOT MADDEN on behalf of DAVID ADE, CITY OF WILDWOOD, ROBERT REGALBUTO, SAMUEL STANGO, JAMES STEVENS (MADDEN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
24 24 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/01 11:53 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/16/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 6/30/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2025 if no expert discovery is conducted. If expert discovery is conducted, dispositive motions shall be filed with the Clerk no later than 10/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 3/31/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 03/31 4:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, and for good cause shown, the joint oral application on 3/31/2025 for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, is hereby GRANTED . An amended scheduling order shall issue. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 3/31/2025. (bda)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 03/31 4:25 PM
Joint oral application on 3/31/2025 for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (bda)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 03/31 10:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/31/2025. (bda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/19 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY R. BIEG on behalf of DAVID ADE, CITY OF WILDWOOD, ROBERT REGALBUTO, SAMUEL STANGO, JAMES STEVENS (BIEG, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
20 20 order Order Mon 01/06 1:49 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having conducted a telephone status conference with the parties, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the scheduling deadlines in the Court's August 5, 2024 Scheduling Order, ECF No. 15, shall remain in effect. The Court will conduct a telephone status conference on March 31, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall dial 1-856-210-8988, access code 522984708# to connect to the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 1/6/2025. (bda)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by AYMEN A. ABOUSHI on behalf of JOSHUA BOCCHINO (ABOUSHI, AYMEN)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 01/06 11:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/6/2025. (bda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
18 18 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Thu 10/31 1:59 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 10/31/2024. (dmw)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Proposed Order Thu 10/31 12:13 PM
Proposed Order Confidentialty Order by DAVID ADE, CITY OF WILDWOOD, ROBERT REGALBUTO, SAMUEL STANGO, JAMES STEVENS, WILDWOOD POLICE DEPARTMENT.(BIRCHMEIER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ltr to Court
Monday, October 21, 2024
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 10/21 12:25 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having conducted a telephone status conference with the parties, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the Court's August 2, 2024 Scheduling Order, ECF No. 15, shall remain in effect. The Court will conduct a telephone status conference on January 6, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall dial 1-856-210-8988, access code 548935744# to connect to the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 10/21/2024. (bda)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 10/21 11:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/21/2024. (bda)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/05 12:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/21/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2025. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 4/30/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2025 if no expert discovery is conducted. If expert discovery is conducted, dispositive motions shall be filed with the Clerk no later than 8/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 8/2/2024. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 08/02 12:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/2/2024. (bda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
14 14 order Order Tue 07/16 4:44 PM
TEXT ORDER: The the initial scheduling conference on July 19, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED to August 2, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. in Camden - Room 2040. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 7/16/2024. (bda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Thu 07/11 8:07 PM
Letter from Joel Silberman, Esq. on behalf of All Parties Regarding Scheduled Rule 16 Conferfence. (SILBERMAN, JOEL)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 07/11 8:06 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by JOSHUA BOCCHINO.(SILBERMAN, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
11 11 order Order Mon 07/08 1:45 PM
TEXT ORDER: Having received Plaintiff's letter, ECF No. 10, the Court RESCHEDULES the initial scheduling conference on July 10, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. to July 19, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. in Camden - Room 2040 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 7/8/2024. (bda)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Fri 07/05 11:51 AM
Letter from Joel Silberman, Esq. on behalf of All Parties Requesting the Rule 16 Conference be Conducted Telephonically. (SILBERMAN, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
9 9 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Fri 06/07 10:38 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 7/10/2024 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 6/7/2024. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
8 8 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Thu 06/06 10:36 AM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by DAVID ADE, CITY OF WILDWOOD, ROBERT REGALBUTO, SAMUEL STANGO, JAMES STEVENS, WILDWOOD POLICE DEPARTMENT. (BIRCHMEIER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/06 10:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by DAVID ADE, CITY OF WILDWOOD, JOHN DOES 1-10, ROBERT REGALBUTO, SAMUEL STANGO, JAMES STEVENS, WILDWOOD POLICE DEPARTMENT.(BIRCHMEIER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/04 3:59 PM
ORDER Granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that the Defendants, City of Wildwood, Wildwood Police Department, Chief Robert Regalbuto, Detective James Stevens, Officer Samuel Stango, and Officer David Ade are granted leave to answer, move or otherwise reply to the Complaint within 20 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 6/4/2024. (dmr)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/04 12:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DAVID ADE, CITY OF WILDWOOD, ROBERT REGALBUTO, SAMUEL STANGO, JAMES STEVENS, WILDWOOD POLICE DEPARTMENT.(BIRCHMEIER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Statement No Brief is Necessary,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/04 2:11 PM
Set Deadlines as to5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Motion set for 7/1/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/24 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES R. BIRCHMEIER on behalf of All Defendants (BIRCHMEIER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 05, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Sun 05/05 3:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSHUA BOCCHINO. DAVID ADE served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; CITY OF WILDWOOD served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; ROBERT REGALBUTO served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; SAMUEL STANGO served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; JAMES STEVENS served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; WILDWOOD POLICE DEPARTMENT served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (SILBERMAN, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/18 12:26 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DAVID ADE, CITY OF WILDWOOD, ROBERT REGALBUTO, SAMUEL STANGO, JAMES STEVENS, WILDWOOD POLICE DEPARTMENT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms2)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/18 11:38 AM
Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (mmb, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Thu 04/18 12:22 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (sms2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 04/18 12:24 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption; Parties should be listed the exact way they appear on the complaint. Failure to do so will result in the caption generating incorrectly. Party Information; Defendants' title information was included as their first names. Plaintiff's first and last name was reversed. Party text information was not included on the docket. Parties listed in complaint were not included on the docket . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/17 9:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15293436) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BOCCHINO JOSHUA.(SILBERMAN, JOEL)
Related: [-]