Ryan Garcia et al v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01758 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 1:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours & Co
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Does 1 - 25
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Tereasa Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 04/17 3:31 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 4/9/2024), Ryan Garcia et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-01758-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Superior Court of the State of California in Alameda County (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 3:30 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11698310.), filed by Ryan Garcia, Tereasa Garcia. Service due by 7/8/2024(sshe, ) |