District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00139
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 3:33 AM EDT
Defendant
EDWARD ANDERSON (3)
Represented By
H. Heather Shaner
Law Offices Of H. Heather Shaner
contact info
Nicholas George Madiou
Brennan, Mckenna & Lawlor, Chartered
contact info
Defendant
ROSELLE ARTIS (4)
Represented By
Mark M Rollins
Rollins & Chan
contact info
Defendant
JERMAINE HORNE (1)
Represented By
Dwight E. Crawley
Law Office Of Dwight Crawley
contact info
Defendant
GILBERTO PAZ MADRID (2)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Timothy J. Coley
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Alicia M. Long
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Thomas G. Strong
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/14/2024 1:45 AM EST
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to JERMAINE HORNE (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, GILBERTO PAZ MADRID (2) count(s) 1, EDWARD ANDERSON (3) count(s) 3, 4, ROSELLE ARTIS (4) count(s) 3, 4. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zltp)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to JERMAINE HORNE, GILBERTO PAZ MADRID, EDWARD ANDERSON, ROSELLE ARTIS.(zltp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to JERMAINE HORNE (1), GILBERTO PAZ MADRID (2), EDWARD ANDERSON (3), ROSELLE ARTIS (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/19/2024. (zltp) Modified text on 3/20/2024 (zltp).
Related: [-]