Mendoza v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Jeff Armistead |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00664 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 04/26 4:08 PM
Notice of Appearance of Christopher Vieira appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Vieira, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/25 11:31 AM
Notice of Appearance of Kevin C. Danielson appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Danielson, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 8:36 AM
Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dino) |
||
order
Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT
Thu 04/18 3:23 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (pjg) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Wed 04/17 8:52 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Lidiana Marie Mendoza. (Lehrkind, Margaret) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Wed 04/17 8:49 PM
Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected) . Plaintiff consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Filed by Lidiana Marie Mendoza against Commissioner Social Security Administration Social Security Answer is due by 8/15/2024.. (Lehrkind, Margaret) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |