Amy Battaglia v. Ideal Image of Pennsylvania LLC, et al
Original Case: 2:23-cv-01292
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01457 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
IDEAL IMAGE OF PENNSYLVANIA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
IDEAL IMAGE DEVELOPMENT INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
AMY BATTAGLIA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 5:26 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Ideal Image Development Inc and Ideal Image of Pennsylvania LLC in District Court No. 2-23-cv-01292. (JK) | ||
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Standing Order Excess Pagination | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK) | ||
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (JK) |