Original Case: 2:23-cv-12123

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01317
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2025 3:25 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
LADEL LEWIS
Represented By
Sheldon H. Klein
Butzel Long
contact info
Frederick A. Berg Jr.
Butzel Long
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BEVERLY BIGGS-LEAVY
Represented By
Lawrence A. Katz
Coffey & Kaye
contact info

GPO Feb 10 2025
UNPUBLISHED OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : AFFIRMED. Mandate to issue. Decision not for publication. Helene N. White, Chad A. Readler (AUTHORING), and Andre B. Mathis, Circuit Judges.

Docket last updated: 02/12/2025 3:25 AM CST
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
The case manager for this case is: Mr Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Beverly Biggs-Leavy. Transcript needed: n. (RGF)
Related: [-]
6 pgs BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/28/2024;. appellee brief due 06/25/2024; (RGF)
Related: [-]