Optical Works and Logistics, LLC v. Sentinel Insurance Company, et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-00163
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-01371 |
Type | civil / private / contract |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
SENTINEL INSURANCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
OPTICAL WORKS AND LOGISTICS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 5:00 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #157) filed by Appellant Optical Works and Logistics, LLC. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 05/01/2024. 24-1371 (AVN) | ||
Att: 1 91 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |