Jeffrey Chijioke-Uche v. Equifax Information Services LLC, et al
Original Case: 2:19-cv-04006
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01690 |
Type | civil / private / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TRANSUNION LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC, D/B/A GM FINANCIAL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JEFFREY SOLOMON CHIJIOKE-UCHE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 4:29 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Jeffrey Chijioke-Uche in District Court No. 2-19-cv-04006, transferred from the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals, Case No. 24-1254 by order entered April 15, 2024. (AMR) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 3 6 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 4 134 pgs District Court Order 112223 | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Federal Circuit Transfer Order 041524 | ||
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (AMR) |