Jason Ho, et al v. Lower Merion School District
Original Case: 2:23-cv-00386
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01643 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
LOWER MERION SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JASON HO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
THANH HO, PARENTS OF JASON HO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LAN TU TRINH, PARENTS OF JASON HO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 4:29 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Jason Ho, Thanh Ho and Lan Tu Trinh in District Court No. 2-23-cv-00386. (JK) | ||
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Order 03/06/2024 | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs District Court Order 02/14/2024 | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK) | ||
1 pgs ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael D. Kristofco on behalf of Appellee(s) Lower Merion School District. 24-1643 (MDK) | ||
1 pgs OSEI ORDER SENT informing Appellants Thanh Ho and Lan Tu Trinh that a party cannot represent another party in this Court. Accordingly, this action will not proceed as to Jason Ho unless an attorney enters an appearance on his behalf within 21 days of the date of this order. (JK) |