Szelkowski v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Terrence G Berg |
Referred: | Anthony P Patti |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11021 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Livingston County Circuit Court, 24-32233-NO |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peggy Szelkowski
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Thu 04/18 10:32 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Wright, Nicole) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Thu 04/18 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Livingston County Circuit Court, case number 24-32233 NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9756468 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Wright, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, Service of Process - Process Server on March 21, 2024, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, Correspondence to Plaintiffs Attorney dated April 2, 2024, along with Proposed Stipulated Order Capping Damages, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, Email from Plaintiffs Attorney dated April 2, 2024, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, Stipulated Order for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice | ||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Thu 04/18 11:57 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JPar) |