Garcia v. State of Florida Department of Children and Family Services
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Becerra |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21455 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 12:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
Florida Department of Children and Family Services
|
|
Plaintiff
Juan Manuel Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Wed 05/01 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) 2nd Amended by Juan Garcia re3 Summons Issued (Markowitz, Leigh) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/01 8:12 AM
Summons Issued as to State of Florida Department of Children and Family Services. (scn) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Tue 04/30 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Amended by Juan Garcia re1 Complaint filed by Juan Garcia (Markowitz, Leigh) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Fri 04/19 10:11 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. The Court enters the following Order to apprise the parties of its procedures on service, defaults, certificates of interested parties and joint scheduling reports. The parties shall comply with the following: 1. SERVICE : Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires service of summons and complaint to be perfected upon Defendants within 90 days after the filing of the complaint. Unless service is waived, proof of service must be made to the Court by filing the server's affidavit. If a Defendant waives service, notice of the same shall be filed immediately. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause within 90 days will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. 2. DEFAULTS : In the event a served Defendant does not appear in this action, the Plaintiffs shall file a motion for clerk's default within seven days of the deadline for the Defendant to answer. Extensions of time to answer a pleading must take the form of a motion to the Court. Motions for final default judgment, if applicable, shall be filed within seven days of the entry of default. 3. CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES : Within fifteen days from the date the last Defendant enters an appearance in this action, the parties, including governmental parties, must file Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties must not include the undersigned or the assigned Magistrate Judge as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the Certificates. 4. JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS : Within twenty days from the date the last Defendant enters an appearance in this action, the parties are directed to prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report as required by Local Rule 16.1. Disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(l) must be made at or before the time the parties confer to develop their case management and discovery plan. The parties must certify in the Joint Scheduling Report that such disclosures have been made unless a party files an objection to a required disclosure. Such filed objection must include a full explanation of the basis for the objection. The scheduling conference may be held via video conference or in person. It may not be held by telephone. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 4/19/2024. (ymr) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 2:38 PM
Summons Issued as to State of Florida Department of Children and Family Services. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/18 2:29 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Florida Department of Children and Family Services. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17458578, filed by Juan Manuel Garcia.(Markowitz, Leigh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |