Hill v. Commissioner of Social Security
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00043 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/23 1:02 PM
ORDER: Currently pending is Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Docket No.2 .) The filing includes a completed application to proceed without preparing fees or costs, as well as an affidavit in support of the application. (Id.) Upon review of the filing, Plaintiff's application (Docket No.2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 04/23/24. (ad) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Consent of the Parties
Mon 04/22 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Consent of the Plaintiff filed by Katrina Lynn Hill. (ad) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 8:19 AM
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). (kc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/18/2024) (kc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Thu 04/18 8:16 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 04/18 8:23 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for April Adams Carr admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 8:14 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Katrina Lynn Hill. (kc) Modified on 4/18/2024 (kc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Social Security Complaint
Thu 04/18 8:10 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Katrina Lynn Hill. (IFP pending.)(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeal Council Action, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet |