Glenn v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | N Reid Neureiter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01040 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Broomfield County District Court, 2024CV30089 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 11:09 AM MDT |
Defendant
USAA Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean F. Glenn Living Trust, by and through Sean Glenn, Trustee
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/02 8:43 AM
NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Kust, Katherine) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 8:25 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kust, Katherine) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/25 12:56 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint and Jury Demand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Kust, Katherine) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Statement
Wed 04/24 10:59 AM
STATEMENT CITIZENSHIP DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1(a)(2) by Plaintiff Sean Glenn. (Archuleta, Nathanael) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/22 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Michael Drake on behalf of Sean GlennAttorney Christopher Michael Drake added to party Sean Glenn(pty:pla) (Drake, Christopher) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/22 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathanael Thomas Archuleta on behalf of Sean GlennAttorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Sean Glenn(pty:pla) (Archuleta, Nathanael) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 4:05 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SET On or before June 27, 2024, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #6), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: July 11, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937#. If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/18/2024. (norlin, ) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Thu 04/18 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marilyn S. Chappell on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Marilyn S. Chappell added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Chappell, Marilyn) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thu 04/18 11:34 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 04/18 11:33 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Thu 04/18 11:32 AM
DECLARATION of Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet upon USAA Casualty Insurance Company on 03/19/2024. (blaws) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 11:31 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against USAA Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Sean Glenn. (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Thu 04/18 11:29 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/18 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from District Court, Broomfield County, Colorado, Case Number 2024CV30089. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9643457), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Kust, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - State Court Civil Cover Sheet |