New York Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Karas
Case #: 7:24-cv-02938
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ra Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Beacon City School District
Represented By
Deanna L. Collins
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Glenn
Represented By
Stewart Lee Karlin
Stewart Lee Karlin, Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/26 11:07 AM
ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. So Ordered. Motions due by 4/16/2025. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/26/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time Wed 03/26 9:24 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to extend the time to restore the case and to file dismissal papers to April 16, 2025 or in the alternative to restore the case to the active docket addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Stewart Karlin dated March 26, 2025. Document filed by Daniel Glenn..(Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 03/10 12:13 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. So Ordered. ( Motions due by 3/31/2025.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/10/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time Thu 03/06 6:05 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to restore the case from 3/15 to 3/31 addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Stewart Karlin dated March 6, 2025. Document filed by Daniel Glenn..(Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 02/13 4:29 PM
ORDER... It is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are denied. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/13/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Thu 12/26 3:31 PM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 2/11/2025 at 10:00 AM in Clerk's Office, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601.(sni)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
minutes Mediation Conference Mon 12/16 1:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 11/22/2024. Mediation Status due by 12/23/2024. (sni)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Mon 11/18 12:22 PM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 12/13/2024 will not be held. Mediation Status due by 12/3/2024.(sni)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Mon 11/18 12:51 PM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 04:00 PM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 10/09 10:23 AM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 12/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Clerk's Office, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601.(sni)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Tue 10/08 9:27 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/04/2024 was not held. Mediation Status due by 10/22/2024.(sni)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 10/08 9:29 AM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/7/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
minutes Mediation Conference Tue 10/08 9:30 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 10/7/2024. Mediation Status due by 11/6/2024. (sni)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 08/28 2:45 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/4/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 07/29 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/28/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
12 12 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Thu 07/25 3:39 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/8/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 07/24 9:13 AM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Beacon City School District..(Collins, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/10 4:50 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Beacon City School District with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Daniel Glenn. Related document:1 Complaint..(Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Notice of Right to Sue
Monday, June 24, 2024
9 9 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 06/24 5:07 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:8 Response to Motion, filed by Daniel Glenn. ENDORSEMENT: In this letter, Plaintiff expresses a desire to file an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is given until 7/10/24 to do so. Within its time to answer, Defendant should either file an Answer or another pre-motion letter. So Ordered. ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2024.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/24/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Response to Motion Mon 06/24 3:38 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Stewart Karlin dated 06/24/2024 re:5 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for defendant to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deanna L. Collins dated 06/03/2024. . Document filed by Daniel Glenn..(Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Tue 06/11 11:15 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deanna L. Collins dated 06/11/2024 re: Defendant's pre-motion letter to Plaintiff's counsel. Document filed by Beacon City School District..(Collins, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 06/05 10:23 AM
ORDER granting5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/4/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/05 10:24 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Beacon City School District answer due 6/11/2024. (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/03 1:47 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for defendant to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deanna L. Collins dated 06/03/2024. Document filed by Beacon City School District..(Collins, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/19 12:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beacon City School District..(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/19 12:35 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/19 12:35 PM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/19 12:35 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/18 12:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/18 12:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beacon City School District, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel Glenn..(Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/18 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Beacon City School District. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29236228)Document filed by Daniel Glenn..(Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter