Charman v. Snap Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dana M Sabraw |
Referred: | Valerie E Torres |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00694 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227(b)(3) Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 11:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Snap Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Thane Charman
individual 2270 Boundary Street
San Diego, CA 92104 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Leave to Electronically File Documents
Wed 05/01 1:23 PM
MOTION To Grant Leave To Electronically File by Thane Charman. (ddf) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 9:39 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (axi) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 9:31 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Snap Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 152838.), filed by Thane Charman. The new case number is 3:24-cv-694-DMS-VET. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case.(axi) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt |