Purewal v. InstaRisa Digital Dental Technologies, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Mary S Scriven |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00935 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
InstaRisa Digital Dental Technologies, LLC
|
|
Defendant
InstaRisa Technologies, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fernando Polanco Lemus
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Jose Arthur Mirelez Jr.
|
|
Plaintiff
Chandeep Purewal
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons issued
Wed 05/01 12:37 PM
SUMMONS issued as to InstaRisa Digital Dental Technologies, LLC, InstaRisa Technologies, LLC, Fernando Polanco Lemus, Jose Arthur Mirelez Jr. (LD) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/30 10:17 AM
MOTION for Lee Bergstein to appear pro hac vice by Chandeep Purewal.(AA) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/30 10:13 AM
MOTION for Bradley P. Pollina to appear pro hac vice by Chandeep Purewal.(AA) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
misc
Fees Paid
Fri 04/26 3:45 PM
FEES Paid by Chandeep Purewal (Filing fee $405.00, Receipt Number TPA070336). (ARC) |
||
misc
Fees Paid - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/30 10:14 AM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID by attorney Bradley P. Pollina, appearing on behalf of Chandeep Purewal. Related document:3 MOTION for Bradley P. Pollina to appear pro hac vice. (AA) |
||
misc
Fees Paid - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/30 10:18 AM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID by attorney Lee Bergstein, appearing on behalf of Chandeep Purewal. Related document:4 MOTION for Lee Bergstein to appear pro hac vice. (AA) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/19 8:56 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT against InstaRisa Digital Dental Technologies, LLC, InstaRisa Technologies, LLC, Fernando Polanco Lemus, Jose Arthur Mirelez Jr. with Jury Demand filed by Chandeep Purewal. (Filing fee: Not paid. No IFP motion filed.)(AA) (e-portal) |