HALPER-ASEFI et al v. CICCONE et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Rudolph Contreras |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01118 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
MADONNA LOUISE CICCONE
|
|
Defendant
LINCOLN HOLDINGS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
LIVE NATION MTOURS (USA), INC.
|
|
Defendant
NATION WORLDWIDE INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
MARY CONOBOY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NESTOR MONTE, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/30 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus W. Corwin on behalf of MARY CONOBOY, ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI, NESTOR MONTE, JR (Corwin, Marcus) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 3:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Marcus W. Corwin is admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) .[LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/24/2024. (lcrc2) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 04/22 12:41 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
order
Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal
Mon 04/22 9:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Plaintiffs'7 Motion for Leave to File Their Home Addresses Under Seal is GRANTED, as LCvR 5.1(c)(1) permits a party to omit its residential address on the public docket and simultaneously file under seal a notice containing its full address; and (2) Plaintiffs' [7-1] Notice is deemed FILED. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/22/2024. (lcjeb4) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/22 12:38 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmw) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Sealed Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal
Fri 04/19 3:24 PM
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL filed by MARY CONOBOY, ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI, NESTOR MONTE, JR.(Greenbaum, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Plaintiffs' Addresses, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/19 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Errata by MARY CONOBOY, ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI, NESTOR MONTE, JR(Greenbaum, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Corrected Complaint | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)
Fri 04/19 2:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI, NESTOR MONTE, JR, MARY CONOBOY filed by ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI, NESTOR MONTE, JR, MARY CONOBOY.(Greenbaum, David) |
|
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Fri 04/19 8:18 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. Missing civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms using the event Civil Cover Sheet. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Marcus W. Corwin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10836775. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARY CONOBOY, ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI, NESTOR MONTE, JR.(Greenbaum, David) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Thu 04/18 1:56 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE LINCOLN HOLDINGS, LLC D/B/A MONUMENTAL SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT c/o Registered Agent: filed by ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI, NESTOR MONTE, JR, MARY CONOBOY.(Greenbaum, David) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Thu 04/18 1:53 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Madonna filed by ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI, NESTOR MONTE, JR, MARY CONOBOY.(Greenbaum, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Summons for Live Nation Worldwide, | ||
Att: 2 Summons for Live Nation MTours (USA) | ||
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10836465) filed by ELIZABETH HALPER-ASEFI, NESTOR MONTE, JR, MARY CONOBOY.(Greenbaum, David) |