Maffia v. Health Insurance Alliance, LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Raag Singhal |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60632 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Fuego Leads LLC
|
|
Defendant
Health Insurance Alliance, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Maffia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 1:33 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Michael Maffia. Fuego Leads LLC served on 4/23/2024, response/answer due 5/14/2024. (Coleman, Stefan) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 1:30 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Michael Maffia. Health Insurance Alliance, LLC served on 4/23/2024, response/answer due 5/14/2024. (Coleman, Stefan) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 1:33 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Maffia (Coleman, Stefan) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Fri 04/19 9:33 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/19/2024. (pb00) |
|
4 | 4
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Fri 04/19 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Court's CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/19/2024. (pb00) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 3:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Fuego Leads LLC, Health Insurance Alliance, LLC. (cds) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/18 3:35 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 1:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Fuego Leads LLC, Health Insurance Alliance, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17459130, filed by Michael Maffia.(Coleman, Stefan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Health Insurance Alliance, LLC, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) Fuego Leads LLC |