Betancourt v. 16460 NE 16 Ave LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James Lawrence King |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21457 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
16460 NE 16 Ave LLC
|
|
Defendant
Jennifer's Cafeteria, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Rudolph Betancourt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/25 2:24 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Rudolph Betancourt. Jennifer's Cafeteria, Inc. served on 4/23/2024, response/answer due 5/14/2024. (Goldstein, Glenn) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 11:42 AM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Rudolph Betancourt (Goldstein, Glenn) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Fri 04/19 11:42 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel RE Prior Filings Under the ADA by Glenn R Goldstein on behalf of Rudolph Betancourt (Goldstein, Glenn) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 2:46 PM
Summons Issued as to 16460 NE 16 Ave LLC, and Jennifer's Cafeteria, Inc. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/18 2:43 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 1:06 PM
COMPLAINT against 16460 NE 16 Ave LLC, Jennifer's Cafeteria, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17458890, filed by Rudolph Betancourt.(Wassenberg, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |