Florance v. Broome County et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence E Kahn |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-00536 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/23 10:42 AM
TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference scheduled for 8/21/2024 at 1:30PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc ) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Fri 04/19 11:48 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule Conference set for 8/21/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/14/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (amt) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 10:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Frederick J. Akshar, Broome County, Robert Charpinsky, Philip Stephens, Trinity Services Group, Inc.(amt) |
|
Att: 1 Broome County summons, | ||
Att: 2 Charpinsky summons, | ||
Att: 3 Stevens summons, | ||
Att: 4 Trinity summons | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 9:54 AM
TEXT ORDER: Having reviewed Motion For Leave To Proceed In Forma Pauperis2 as filed by Thomas Florance, IFP Motion2 is GRANTED. After a review of the complaint, and in an abundance of caution, the Court directs that summonses be issued and that a response to the complaint is required. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/18/2024. (amt) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Admission Requirement
Thu 04/18 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Florance; Attorney Cassidy Lape. Phone number is 315-703-6500. Admissions due by 5/2/2024. {served via regular mail }(nas) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 1:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas Florance(nas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Frederick J. Akshar, Broome County, Robert Charpinsky, Philip Stephens, Trinity Services Group, Inc. filed by Thomas Florance.(nas ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |