Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00699
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
InterDesign, Inc.
30725 Solon Industrial Parkway
Solon, OH 44139
Represented By
Andrew W. Alexander
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Mark W. McDougall
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Tao Liu
Glacier Law - New York
contact info
Wei Wang
Glacier Law - New York
contact info
Patrick J. Egan
Brouse Mcdowell - Akron
contact info
Dandan Pan
Glacier Law - New York
contact info
David Sporar
Brouse Mcdowell - Cleveland
contact info
Ruoting Men
Glacier Law - New York
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
17 17 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Tue 10/08 3:24 PM
Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order and Judgment Entry
Friday, September 13, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Fri 09/13 2:08 PM
Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in this Court's Order (Doc. No.15 ), Defendant's unopposed motion to dismiss (Doc. No.14 ) is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. This case is closed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 9/13/24. (T,A)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss Fri 09/13 2:05 PM
Order: For the reasons stated herein, Defendant's unopposed motion to dismiss (Doc. No.14 ) is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 9/13/24. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss Tue 07/23 12:50 PM
Unopposed Motion to dismiss Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Defendant InterDesign, Inc..(McDougall, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - July 8, 2024 letter to counsel for Plaintiff
Monday, June 24, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Mon 06/24 12:31 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time until July 24, 2024 to respond to complaint. (Doc No.13 .) Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 6/24/2024. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
13 13 motion Extension (answer complaint) Fri 06/21 10:53 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 24, 2024 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant InterDesign, Inc.. (McDougall, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
12 12 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 05/09 9:36 AM
Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Alexander filed by on behalf of InterDesign, Inc.. (Alexander, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
11 11 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 05/08 10:08 AM
Attorney Appearance by Mark W. McDougall filed by on behalf of InterDesign, Inc.. (McDougall, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 04/30 6:13 PM
Attorney Appearance by Tao Liu filed by on behalf of Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd.. (Liu, Tao)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/29 3:05 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd.. InterDesign, Inc. waiver sent on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024 filed on behalf of Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd. (Sporar, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Wed 04/24 9:16 AM
Order [non-document] granting Attorney Dandan Pan's motion for appearance pro hac vice. (Doc. No.5 .) Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/24/2024. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Wed 04/24 9:21 AM
Order [non-document] granting Attorney Ruoting Men's motion for appearance pro hac vice. (Doc. No.6 .) Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/24/2024. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Wed 04/24 9:24 AM
Order [non-document] granting Attorney Tao Liu's motion for appearance pro hac vice. (Doc. No.7 .) Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/24/2024. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Wed 04/24 11:17 AM
Order [non-document] granting Attorney Wei Wang's motion for appearance pro hac vice. (Doc. No.8 .) Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/24/2024. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/23 3:21 PM
Motion for attorney Wei Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12524157, filed by Plaintiff Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd..(Sporar, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Wei Wang
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/23 3:18 PM
Motion for attorney Tao Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12524142, filed by Plaintiff Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd..(Sporar, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Tao Liu
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/23 3:14 PM
Motion for attorney Routing Men to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12524118, filed by Plaintiff Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd..(Sporar, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Routing Men
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/23 3:10 PM
Motion for attorney Dandan Pan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12524077, filed by Plaintiff Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd..(Sporar, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dandan Pan
Friday, April 19, 2024
4 4 order Initial Order Fri 04/19 2:18 PM
Initial Standing Order signed by Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/19/2024. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
3 3 oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 04/18 1:24 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon InterDesign, Inc. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Thu 04/18 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd. (Sporar, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/18 12:03 PM
Complaint -Declaratory Judgment for Patent Unenforceability, Invalidity, Non-Infringement with jury demand against InterDesign, Inc. Filing fee paid $405.00, receipt number AOHNDC-12516086. Filed by Shenzhen Yihong Technology Co., Ltd. (Sporar, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cease and Desist Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - '293 Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - '588 Patent,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - '116 Patent,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Defendant's 319 Drawings,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 1 pgs Designation Form AO 120,
Att: 8 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 04/18 12:58 PM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 04/18 12:59 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Link to Local Patent Rules Thu 04/18 3:52 PM
This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to [LINK:Local Patent Rules] . (F,AW)
Related: [-]