Chapman v. Yost
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Watson |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01865 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ohio Attorney Genera Dave Yost
Attorney General of Ohio 30 East Broad St., 17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Plaintiff
Tasha Chapman
1539 Republic Avenue
Columbus, OH 43211 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/30 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance of R&R by Plaintiff Tasha Chapman re3 Order and Initial Screen R&R. (mas) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/22 3:45 PM
ORDER AND INITIAL SCREEN R&R: Granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis & Denying2 Motion leave to participate in electronic case filing. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED in its entirety pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that for the foregoing reasons an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Response to objections must be filed within 14 days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/22/2024. (vb) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (vb) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/22 3:49 PM
Set Deadline: Objection to R&R due by 5/6/2024. (vb) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/18 2:55 PM
MOTION for Online Filing by Plaintiff Tasha Chapman. (mas) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 2:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tasha Chapman. (mas) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 USM Forms |