LSV Entertainment, LLC v. Barber et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01867 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 28:1338 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Eddie Barber
2949 Cleinview Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45206 |
|
Defendant
Janetta Boyce-Warren
306 Otterbein Avenue
Dayton, OH 46406 |
|
Defendant
Bobby Glover
4047 Vina Villa Avenue
Dayton, OH 46406 |
|
Defendant
Gregory Jackson
2767 Faber Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45211 |
|
Defendant
Michael Warren
306 Otterbein Avenue
Dayton, OH 46406 |
|
Plaintiff
LSV Entertainment, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 11:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Eddie Barber, Janetta Boyce-Warren, Bobby Glover, Gregory Jackson, Michael Warren. (ds) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/19 3:51 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Rockwell, Joshua) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 3:45 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Roth and Brian S. Levenson as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 19, 2024. (jlk) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 4:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9928008) of Richard Roth, Brian Levenson by Plaintiff LSV Entertainment, LLC. (Rockwell, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of good standing | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 4:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff LSV Entertainment, LLC. (Rockwell, Joshua) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/18 2:18 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff LSV Entertainment, LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Rockwell, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9927225), filed by LSV Entertainment, LLC. (Rockwell, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 |