COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN, PC v. DEFENSE INFORMATION SYSTEMS AGENCY et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John M Younge |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01619 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
DEFENSE INFORMATION SYSTEMS AGENCY
PO Box 549
Fort Meade, MD 20755 |
|
Defendant
JOINT FORCES HEADQUARTERS
1400 Defense Pentagon, Ste. 3E783
Washington, DC 20301 |
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES ARMY CYBER COMMAND
1400 Defense Pentagon, 2E724
Washington, DC 20301 |
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
1400 Defense Pentagon, 2E724
Washington, DC 20301 |
|
Plaintiff
COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN, PC
1600 Market Street, 32nd Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Thu 04/25 3:54 PM
ORDERED THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER, SCHEDULED FOR MAY 8, 2024 AT 12:30 P.M. IS CANCELED.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/25/2024. 4/25/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/25 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN, PC As To PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A) AS TO DEFENDANTS(Payne, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Mon 04/22 9:20 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN, PCS (HEREINAFTER "PLAINTIFF" OR "COHEN SEGLIAS"), MOTION FOR EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (HEREINAFTER "MOTION FOR A TRO ") (ECF NO. 2), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A TRO (ECF NO. 2) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. THE COURT WILL HOLD A STATUS CONFERENCE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ON WEDNESDAY, MAY 8TH, 2024, AT 12:30 P.M. 3. COUNSEL SHALL APPEAR BY VIDEO AND WILL BE NOTIFIED BY CHAMBERS STAFF VIA EMAIL OF THE CONFERENCE LINK INSTRUCTIONS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/19/2024.4/22/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
5 | 5
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Hearings
Fri 04/19 2:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE Video Conference held on 4/19/2024. (sg) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LANDON Y. JONES on behalf of DEFENSE INFORMATION SYSTEMS AGENCY, JOINT FORCES HEADQUARTERS, UNITED STATES ARMY CYBER COMMAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY with Certificate of Service(JONES, LANDON) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/22 9:26 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction . MOTION HEARING SET FOR 5/8/2024 12:30 PM IN Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE. (sg) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 04/18 3:54 PM
Summons Issued as to DEFENSE INFORMATION SYSTEMS AGENCY, JOINT FORCES HEADQUARTERS, UNITED STATES ARMY CYBER COMMAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL AND US ATTORNEY on 4/18/2024 (sg) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 04/18 1:46 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN, PC.Memorandum of Law, Affidavit, Proposed Order.(Payne, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 04/18 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT against DEFENSE INFORMATION SYSTEMS AGENCY, JOINT FORCES HEADQUARTERS, UNITED STATES ARMY CYBER COMMAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17408388.), filed by COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN, PC.(Payne, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |