Gil v. 3499NW LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21461 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
3499NW LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Juan Carlos Gil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Thu 04/25 10:00 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case (Without Prejudice). Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/19 2:55 PM
ORDER dismissing1 Complaint filed by Juan Carlos Gil; Amended Complaint due by 4/24/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to 3499NW LLC. (nwn) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/19 9:52 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT against 3499NW LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17459458, filed by Juan Carlos Gil.(Lungarelli, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |