New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:24-cv-05273
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2024 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
KRISTEN CELIA
Defendant
THOMAS J COLAIEZZI
Defendant
GREGORY J HILL
Represented By
HENRY L. SAURBORN, JR.
Kaiser Saurborn & Mair
contact info
Defendant
LIFEBRAND, INC.
Represented By
JAMES JOSEPH QUINLAN
Lifebrand, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
GREGORY J HILL, SR
Represented By
HENRY L. SAURBORN, JR.
Kaiser Saurborn & Mair
contact info
Plaintiff
RAY BARTOSZEK
Represented By
JEREMY EDWARD GRIVENSKY
Gawthrop Greenwood, PC
contact info
STEPHEN R. MCDONNELL
Gawthrop Greenwood, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 04/24 5:05 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING ACTION: This action is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED pending the sale of the subject property; this shall not constitute a dismissal Order under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; the parties shall file a joint status report on July 31, 2025, and every sixty (60) days thereafter;the parties shall promptly advise the Court upon the action's resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/24/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
25 25 order Order Fri 03/07 12:36 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on March 7, 2025; it is hereby ORDERED that a follow-up telephone status conference is scheduled for April 24, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 852 191 713#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/7/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 03/07 11:27 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/7/2025. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
24 24 order Order Wed 01/15 1:31 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on January 15, 2025; it is hereby ORDERED that a follow-up telephone status conference is scheduled for March 7, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 209 422 827#. The deadlines set forth in the August 21, 2024 Scheduling Order [ECF No. 18] remain in effect. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/15/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 01/15 1:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/15/2025. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
23 23 order Order Thu 10/31 2:41 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on October 31, 2024; it is hereby ORDERED that a follow-up telephone status conference is scheduled for January 15, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 529 517 522#. The deadlines set forth in the August 21, 2024 Scheduling Order [ECF No. 18] remain in effect. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 10/31/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 10/31 1:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/31/2024. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
22 22 order Order Tue 09/24 10:13 AM
TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the telephone status conference scheduled for October 25, 2024 at 11:00 am is being RESCHEDULED to October 31, 2024 at 12:00 pm. All parties shall dial 1-856-210-8988 conference ID# 427 807 30# to connect to the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/24/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Service by Publication Mon 09/23 4:28 PM
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's15 Motion for Service by Publication as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/23/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
20 20 service Acknowledgment of Service Mon 09/16 11:10 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by RAY BARTOSZEK. THOMAS J COLAIEZZI served on 9/6/2024, answer due 9/27/2024; LIFEBRAND, INC. served on 9/6/2024, answer due 9/27/2024. (MCDONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Fri 09/06 3:00 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Ray Bartoszek re: Local Civil Rules 26.1(b)(2) and 26.1(d). (GRIVENSKY, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/21 2:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/25/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Counsel shall dial 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID 427 807 30# to connect to the call. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2024. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 3/3/2025. If expert discovery will be served, dispositive motions shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court no later than 7/8/2025. If expert discovery will not be served, dispositive motions shall be filed by 5/5/2025, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/21/2024. (lm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 08/20 2:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/20/2024. Scheduling Order to be filed. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
17 17 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 12:06 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by GREGORY J HILL, SR, GREGORY J HILL. (SAURBORN, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
16 16 order Order Fri 08/16 9:49 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court noting that the Clerk's Office issued a Quality Control ("QC") Message on April 19, 2024 directing all parties to file a Diversity Disclosure Statement in conformance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2); and the Court further noting that no such statement has been filed by Defendants; it is hereby ORDERED that each Defendant shall file a Diversity Disclosure Statement in advance of the August 20, 2024 initial scheduling conference. Counsel shall refer to the Clerk's QC Message for the link to the form. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/16/24. (lc-asm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
15 15 motion Service by Publication Thu 08/15 4:05 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication - to Deem LifeBrand, Inc. and Thomas J. Colaiezzi Served; or, in the Alternative, for Substituted Service by RAY BARTOSZEK.(MCDONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Deem LifeBrand, Inc. and Thomas J. Colaiezzi Served; or, in the Alternative, for Substituted Service,
Att: 2 Certification Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D,
Att: 8 Exhibit E,
Att: 9 Exhibit F,
Att: 10 Exhibit G,
Att: 11 Exhibit H,
Att: 12 Exhibit I (Declaration of Stephen R. McDonnell in Support of Motion to Deem LifeBrand, Inc. and Thomas J. Colaiezzi Served; or, in the Alternative, for Substituted Service)
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/16 9:46 AM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Service by Publication - to Deem LifeBrand, Inc. and Thomas J. Colaiezzi Served; or, in the Alternative, for Substituted Service . Motion set for 9/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
14 14 discov Joint Discovery Plan Wed 07/31 4:22 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by RAY BARTOSZEK.(GRIVENSKY, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Wed 07/24 3:55 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Ray Bartoszek re: Joint Proposed Discovery Plan & initial scheduling conference. (GRIVENSKY, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/24 3:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint/Amended Complaint and Summons served on Kristen Ceila on 06/26/2024, filed by RAY BARTOSZEK. (MCDONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Wed 07/24 11:14 AM
TEXT ORDER:The initial scheduling conference on August 20, 2024 at 11:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-856-210-8988 conference ID: 104 994 054# Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/24/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
10 10 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Tue 07/23 2:10 PM
Order Initial Conference set for 8/20/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/23/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
9 9 14 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 07/23 11:01 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by GREGORY J HILL, SR, GREGORY J HILL.(SAURBORN, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/26 9:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAY BARTOSZEK. GREGORY J HILL, SR waiver sent on 6/21/2024, answer due 8/20/2024; GREGORY J HILL waiver sent on 5/22/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (MCDONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 06/26 9:28 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by RAY BARTOSZEK. (MCDONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY L. SAURBORN, JR on behalf of GREGORY J HILL, SR, GREGORY J HILL (SAURBORN, HENRY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
5 5 19 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/11 1:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against KRISTEN CELIA, THOMAS J COLAIEZZI, GREGORY J HILL, LIFEBRAND, INC., GREGORY J HILL, SR, filed by RAY BARTOSZEK.(MCDONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 3 pgs Declaration Exhibit M
Friday, April 19, 2024
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 04/19 11:57 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to KRISTEN CELIA, THOMAS J COLAIEZZI, GREGORY J HILL, LIFEBRAND, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Fri 04/19 11:48 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 -1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by STEPHEN R. MCDONNELL on 4/18/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (sms2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 04/19 11:54 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sms2)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 04/19 11:56 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/18 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY EDWARD GRIVENSKY on behalf of RAY BARTOSZEK (GRIVENSKY, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/18 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. MCDONNELL on behalf of RAY BARTOSZEK (MCDONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/18 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT against KRISTEN CELIA, THOMAS J COLAIEZZI, GREGORY J HILL, LIFEBRAND, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15296335), filed by RAY BARTOSZEK.(MCDONNELL, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Certification Verification of Ray Bartoszek,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit J,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit K,
Att: 14 35 pgs Exhibit Exhibit L
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/18 3:04 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (mmb, )
Related: [-]