Marin v. TD Bank USA, N.A.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Trina L Thompson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02313 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 1:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
TD Bank USA, N.A.
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP One California Street 18th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos H. Marin
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 1:35 PM
Order GRANTING 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as Autumn C. Gear. Signed by Judge Trina L Thompson on 4/25/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 10:43 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19355036.) filed by TD Bank USA, N.A..(Gear, Autumn) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/24 1:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to8 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities . The Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2024 is re-set for 6/18/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L Thompson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/24 11:29 AM
MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/4/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Responses due by 5/8/2024. Replies due by 5/15/2024.(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 1:28 PM
Order GRANTING 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian Melendez. Signed by Judge Trina L Thompson on 4/23/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 12:43 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19347045.) filed by TD Bank USA, N.A..(Melendez, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 04/19 7:48 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
4 | 4
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 04/18 4:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TD Bank USA, N.A. of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/18 2:45 PM
Case assigned to Judge Trina L Thompson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 04/18 12:38 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by TD Bank USA, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent The Toronto-Dominion Bank, Other Affiliate TD Bank US Holding Company, a Delaware corporation, Other Affiliate TD Group US Holding LLC, Other Affiliate Target Enterprise, Inc. for TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/18 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superior Court, Southern Branch. Their case number is 24-SCS-00187. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19332920). Filed by TD Bank USA, N.A..(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Online Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Claim, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Fee Waiver, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Correspondence, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Amended Claim, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |