Hale v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Company et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00980 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Civil District Court Parish of Orleans, 23-11596 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 3:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
Evex Logistics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trisura Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donald Ware
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Hale
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Tue 04/30 12:02 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trisura Group, Ltd. for Trisura Specialty Insurance Company (McAllister, Sean) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 3:13 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Trisura amend its Notice of Removal to include "summary-judgment type evidence" demonstrating the amount in controversy in this case exceeds $75,000 by Monday, May 13, 2024. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/29/2024.(pp) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal
Thu 04/25 12:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,,, with Jury Demand by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company.(McAllister, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Text Order
Tue 04/23 1:26 PM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) - A defendant has made an appearance in this matter and a preliminary conference has been set by the Case Manager. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 16(b)(2), IT IS ORDERED that at least fourteen (14) days before the scheduled preliminary conference, the plaintiff(s) shall provide an update to the Court with regards to service or attempted service upon on any defendant(s) who have not been served and/or have not made an appearance. The update should be emailed to chambers at efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov and to all counsel of record in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) provide the "Notice of Preliminary Conference" to any defendants who have not been served and/or have not made an appearance in this matter.(bwn) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Set Hearings
Tue 04/23 1:24 PM
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) |
|
3 | 3
order
Text Order
Tue 04/23 1:21 PM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 04/18 2:46 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (meb) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/18 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-11596 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10493173) filed by Donald Ware, Evex Logistics, LLC, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company.Attorney Sean Michael McAllister added to party Evex Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Michael McAllister added to party Trisura Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Michael McAllister added to party Donald Ware(pty:dft).(McAllister, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Filing, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Compliance, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B- Ochsner Bills, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C- Notice of Filing State Court, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D- State Court File, | ||
Att: 8 List of Pleadings, | ||
Att: 9 List of Parties |