Ochoa v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00726 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, 24-CA-002179-O |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Manuel Ochoa
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/02 4:13 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jose Manuel Ochoa. (Sahadeo, Ravin) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of lis pendens
Thu 05/02 4:10 PM
NOTICE of lis pendens by Jose Manuel Ochoa (Sahadeo, Ravin) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 05/02 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ravin James Sahadeo on behalf of Jose Manuel Ochoa. Lead Counsel: Ravin Sahadeo. (Sahadeo, Ravin) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement
Thu 05/02 8:42 AM
Supplemental MOTION to Supplement7 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum by All Defendants. (Trybus, Bruce) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/24 7:37 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Trybus, Bruce) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/24 7:36 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Trybus, Bruce) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 2:00 PM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 04/22 1:40 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/22/2024. (MEH) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 1:39 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/22/2024. (MEH) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 12:31 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-726-CEM-DCI. (AA) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/18 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, case number 24-CA-002179-O filed in State Court on 3/13/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21999618 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Trybus, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Civil Remedy Notice of Insurer Violations, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Civil Remedy Notice of Insurer Violations, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Pleadings |