De La Torre Pardo v. TGC LPSC LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21468 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
DOMENICO'S ITALIAN DELI INC
|
|
Defendant
SUBWAY 51926, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TGC LPSC LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/30 11:46 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo. TGC LPSC LLC served on 4/23/2024, response/answer due 5/14/2024. (Virues, Beverly) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 7:28 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo. Subway 51926, Inc served on 4/23/2024, response/answer due 5/14/2024. (Virues, Beverly) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Fri 04/19 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. §§ 12181 et seq. In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster an early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED as follows: Within fourteen (14) days of service of the Complaint, Defendants shall file a report with the Court indicating whether it agrees to (1) remediate the deficiencies identified in the Complaint, (2) entry of an injunction to ensure future compliance, and (3) pay Plaintiff's reasonable attorney's fees and costs, as determined by the Court or agreement by the parties. If so, Defendants shall include a reasonable timeline for remediation. If, upon review of the report, the Court finds that Defendants intend to remediate the property within a reasonable time, the action shall be stayed. If requested, the Court may grant proportional discovery to verify Defendant's remediation of the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint. After receiving notice from the parties that the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint have been remediated, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed order of dismissal, including an injunction for future compliance and an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Disputes will be resolved by the Court. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/19/2024. (aci) |
|
4 | 4
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Fri 04/19 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/19/2024. (aci) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 8:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Domenico's Italian Deli Inc, Subway 51926, Inc, and TGC LPSC LLC. (wce) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/19 8:22 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against DOMENICO'S ITALIAN DELI INC, SUBWAY 51926, INC., TGC LPSC LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17460400, filed by Nigel Frank De La Torre Pardo.(Virues, Beverly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) |