Price v. Commissioner of Social Security
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | H Brent Brennenstuhl |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00041 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Social Security Case Assignment
Fri 04/19 4:12 PM
Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 5/10/2024. (DeW) |
|
5 | 5
service
SSA Notice of Service
Fri 04/19 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE: Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and[LINK:General Order 2023-2:] , the Court hereby notifies the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Kentucky that a Complaint seeking judicial review has been filed. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the official notification referenced in Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions. The plaintiff does not need to serve separately a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Entry. No Document is attached. (DeW) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 4:08 PM
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 4/19/2024 granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's complaint and to effectuate service on the Commissioner of Social Security and the United States Attorney for the Western District of Kentucky electronically by the process outlined in General Order No. 2023-02. cc: Counsel (DeW) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 3:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Albert Christopher Price. (HMC) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Thu 04/18 3:56 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. (HMC) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Albert Christopher Price against Commissioner of Social Security. (HMC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet |