Hailey v. Logan County Detention Center et al
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph H Mckinley, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00060 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 30, 2024 |
Defendant
Chief Trimmer
|
|
Defendant
Logan County Detention Center
|
|
Defendant
Timothy Burchett
|
|
Plaintiff
William T. Hailey
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/30 4:15 PM
ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 4/29/2024: IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed. This is a final Order. The Court certifies that an appeal in forma pauperis would be frivolous and therefore would not be taken in good faith. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (EAS) |
|
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Tue 04/30 4:12 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 4/29/2024: The Court will enter a separate Order dismissing this action for the reasons set forth herein.cc: Plaintiff, pro se (EAS) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/24 12:42 PM
ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 4/23/2024 granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying as moot4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Logan County Detention Center shall collect the $350 filing fee from the Plaintiff's prison trust account (*see Order for specifics). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Finance USDC WDKY; LCDC, Attn: Inmate Accounts(EAS) |
|
utility
Schedules
Wed 04/24 12:45 PM
Schedules Initial Review due by 8/26/2024. (EAS) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Fri 04/19 3:13 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William T. Hailey,3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William T. Hailey by William T. Hailey. (EAS) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 3:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William T. Hailey (EAS) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 3:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William T. Hailey (EAS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Thu 04/18 3:26 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EAS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Timothy Burchett, Logan County Detention Center, Chief Trimmer, filed by William T. Hailey. (EAS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons |