New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:24-cv-02952
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 15, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Aero Global, LLC
Represented By
Avery Horovitz
Bochner PLLC
contact info
Serge Krimnus
Bochner PLLC
contact info
Ariel Reinitz
Bochner PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Linfo IP, LLC
Represented By
William P. Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info
David John Hoffman
Law Office David J. Hoffman
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
American Exchange Apparel Group, Corp.
Terminated: 06/07/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Bochner
Bochner PLLC
contact info
Serge Krimnus
Bochner PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
52 52 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/21 3:20 PM
ORDER denying45 Motion to Dismiss; denying47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Substantially for reasons set forth in Defendant's submissions at ECF Nos. 46 and 51, Plaintiff's motion to dismiss without prejudice (ECF No. 45) and motion to stay because it "wish[es] to save expenses" (ECF No. 47) are denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at Docket Numbers 45 and 47. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/21/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]