DMV Convenience, Inc. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Friedman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01133 |
Nature of Suit | 891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts |
Cause | 07:2023 Judicial Review of Admin Determination by DOA |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 6:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
|
Plaintiff
DMV Convenience, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 04/22 11:02 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zcb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/22 10:29 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zcb) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)
Fri 04/19 11:51 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by DMV CONVENIENCE, INC. filed by DMV CONVENIENCE, INC..(Fried, Stewart) |
|
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Fri 04/19 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Invalid/No signature on Civil Cover Sheet. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or /s/ Attorney Name to represent an electronic signature of the filer. (zcb) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Fri 04/19 10:15 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DMV CONVENIENCE, INC. (zcb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 5:45 PM
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10837520) filed by DMV Convenience, Inc..(Fried, Stewart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Corporate Disclosure |