New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:24-bk-41669
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Dismissed:Jun 05, 2024
Terminated:Jul 18, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Olympia Pita 1 LLC
1419 Coney Island Ave
Brooklyn, NY 11230-4137
Represented By
Olympia Pita 1 LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, July 18, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 07/18 11:38 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ylr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
27 27 order Generic Order Sat 06/08 6:20 PM
Order Discharging Trustee ; Ordered that Salvatore LaMonica as Subchapter V Trustee of the above captioned estate be and hereby is discharged. Related [+]. Signed on 6/7/2024 (ssw)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Olympia Pita 1 LLC,8 Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee,24 Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Sat 06/08 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 06/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
25 25 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd Fri 06/07 4:29 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 2 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $0.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Salvatore LaMonica Esq.. (LaMonica, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
24 24 order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal Wed 06/05 1:42 PM
Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal for failure to be represented by counsel. Related [+]. Signed on 6/5/2024 (ssw)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Olympia Pita 1 LLC
Friday, May 31, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK) Mon 06/03 7:31 AM
Hearing Held; No appearance by Debtor -Appearances: Yehezkel Salman, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Office of the United States Trustee. Related [+] No opposition - Granted - Dismissed - Court to issue order. (sej)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK) Mon 06/03 7:31 AM
Hearing Held; Related [+] No appearance by Debtor -Appearances: Yehezkel Salman, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Office of the United States Trustee. MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 05/31/2024 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sej)
Related: [-] 17 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Sunday, May 12, 2024
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Mon 05/13 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 05/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Mon 05/13 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 05/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Mon 05/13 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 05/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Mon 05/13 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 05/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Sat 05/11 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Court's Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 11:13 AM
Court's Service List Related [+] (ssw)
Related: [-] 17 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
15 15 order Generic Order Fri 05/10 8:20 AM
Sub Chapter V Case Management Order, The Debtor shall file and serve upon the Office of the United States Trustee and the Subchapter V Case Trustee monthly operating reports in the form prescribed by the Office of the United States Trustee by the 21st day of the month following the reporting period. The Debtor shall file its most recent balance sheet, its most recent statement of operations, its most recent cash flow statement, and its most recent federal income tax return, by May 30, 2024. The Debtor shall file and serve a plan of reorganization on Official Form 425A, that conforms to the requirements of Bankruptcy Code Sections 1190 and 1191 and the applicable provisions of Bankruptcy Code Section 1123 and 1129, by July 17, 2024. Any secured creditor may make an election under Bankruptcy Code Section 1111(b)(2) by no later than ten days following the filing of the plan. Related [+]. Signed on 5/10/2024 (ssw)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Olympia Pita 1 LLC
Thursday, May 09, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Fri 05/10 11:11 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference 5/30/2024. Status hearing to be held on 5/31/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. The Debtor shall file and serve on the Sub chapter V Case Trustee, the United States Trustee, and all other parties in interest, a report setting forth the efforts the debtor has undertaken and will undertake to attain a consensual plan of reorganization, as required by Bankruptcy Code Section 1188(c), by May 30, 2024. Signed on 5/9/2024. (ssw)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Fri 05/10 8:22 AM
Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim. Signed on 5/9/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 7/17/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/15/2024. (ssw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
14 14 order Schedule Hearing (Generic) Wed 05/08 3:56 PM
Order Scheduling Continued Hearing on Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel Related [+]. Signed on 5/8/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/31/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (ssw)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Wed 05/08 12:36 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Yehezkel Salman, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Office of the United States Trustee - No Appearance by Debtor 'Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] Court to issue scheduling order (sej)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel
Thursday, April 25, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 04/26 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/25 10:39 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Leo V. Gagion on behalf of New York State Department of Taxation and Finance (Gagion, Leo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
11 11 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Tue 04/23 9:09 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2024 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 953-2748, Participant Code 3415538, Enter # sign. (Scott, Shannon)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 04/23 8:59 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Adam E Mikolay on behalf of YEHEZKEL SALMAN Related [+] (Mikolay, Adam)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor YEHEZKEL SALMAN
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/23 8:58 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Adam E Mikolay on behalf of YEHEZKEL SALMAN (Mikolay, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
8 8 1 pgs trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Mon 04/22 10:54 AM
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Salvatore LaMonica, Esq. added to the case. at Filed by Office of the United States Trustee.(Scott, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement
Sunday, April 21, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing Ch. 11 Mon 04/22 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing - Chapter 11 Non-Individual Notice Date 04/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sun 04/21 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sun 04/21 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
4 4 court Notice of Hearing of Defective or Deficient Filing of Non-Individual Chapter 11 Case Fri 04/19 9:10 AM
Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel.Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. . Chapter 11 Non-Individual Attorney Cure due by 5/3/2024. Related [+] (nop)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Olympia Pita 1 LLC
Thursday, April 18, 2024
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Thu 04/18 2:39 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Filing fee for commencing a bankruptcy case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1930a due by 4/18/2024. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 4/18/2024.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/18/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/18/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/18/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/18/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/18/2024. Subchapter V Balance Sheet due by 4/25/2024. Subchapter V Cash Flow Statement due by 4/25/2024. Small Business Statement of Operations Subchapter V due by 4/25/2024. Subchapter V Tax Return due by 4/25/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 5/2/2024. Schedule A/B due 5/2/2024. Schedule D due 5/2/2024. Schedule E/F due 5/2/2024. Schedule G due 5/2/2024. Schedule H due 5/2/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 5/2/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/2/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 5/2/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 5/2/2024. (nop)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deficiency Concerning Requirement of Photo Identification Thu 04/18 2:24 PM
Notice of Deficiency Concerning Requirement of Photo Identification for the Debtor.Debtor(s) Acceptable Photo Identification due by 5/2/2024. (nop)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/18 2:13 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 0.00. Filed by Olympia Pita 1 LLC Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 7/17/2024. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 7/17/2024. (nop)
Related: [-]
utility ~Force Judge Assignment Thu 04/18 2:15 PM
Judge Assigned Due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. (nop)
Related: [-]
court Related Cases Thu 04/18 2:15 PM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 1 23-44114 ess, Bay Pita LLC (nop)
Related: [-]