Mitchell v. Payne
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristine G Baker |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00342 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/01 4:47 PM
ORDER denying4 Mr. Mitchell's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing him to pay the $5 filing fee by 05/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 05/01/2024. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/30 2:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Mitchell. (ldb) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 2:10 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to send Mr. Mitchell a Form AO-240; and directing Mr. Mitchell to either file the completed Application, including the Certificate of Prisoner Accounts, or pay the $5.00 filing fee, in full on or before Monday, 5/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 4/22/2024. (ldb) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
30+
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Thu 04/18 3:27 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Mitchell. (ajj) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 04/18 3:25 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Mitchell. (ajj) |