8
|
|
8
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/03 3:09 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 3 May 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/11/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Continuation of Main Document,
|
| |
Att: 2
Continuation of Main Document
|
7
|
|
7
order
Minute Order
Fri 05/03 1:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3] is July 5, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 5/3/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/29 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anne Lynette Stuller on behalf of Brighton School District 27JAttorney Anne Lynette Stuller added to party Brighton School District 27J(pty:dft) (Stuller, Anne)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 04/26 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elliott Vallen Hood on behalf of Brighton School District 27JAttorney Elliott Vallen Hood added to party Brighton School District 27J(pty:dft) (Hood, Elliott)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 04/25 2:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fallon Chavez-Bravo. Brighton School District 27J waiver sent on 4/25/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Raykin, Igor)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Fri 04/19 8:03 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 04/19 8:01 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Brighton School District 27J (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9644194)Attorney Igor Raykin added to party Fallon Chavez-Bravo(pty:pla), filed by Fallon Chavez-Bravo.(Raykin, Igor)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|